HI HB981 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB981
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Hawaii labor relations board to request the parties appearing before the board to draft decisions and orders to enable a quicker process to resolve cases.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Labor Relations Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB981 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1114 (Same As) 2017-02-24 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
SB1114 (Same As) 2017-02-24 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Decisions and Orders
Hawaii Employment Relations Act
Hawaii Labor Relations Board
Occupational Safety and Health
Public Collective Bargaining
Hawaii Employment Relations Act
Hawaii Labor Relations Board
Occupational Safety and Health
Public Collective Bargaining
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=981&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB981_.HTM |