HI HB981 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB981
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the Hawaii labor relations board to request the parties appearing before the board to draft decisions and orders to enable a quicker process to resolve cases.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Labor Relations Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1114 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB981 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB981 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Decisions and Orders
Hawaii Employment Relations Act
Hawaii Labor Relations Board
Occupational Safety and Health
Public Collective Bargaining
Hawaii Employment Relations Act
Hawaii Labor Relations Board
Occupational Safety and Health
Public Collective Bargaining
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=981&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB981_.HTM |