HI HCR137 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 663).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 663).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Convene A Working Group To Review After-school Programs In Hawaii's Public Middle And Intermediate Schools.
Title
After-School Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 663). |
2016-04-27 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2016-04-27 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2016-04-27 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2016-04-25 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 701) in amended form (SD 2). |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3697) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2016-04-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-21-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3615), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Chun Oakland, K.Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Dela Cruz, Slom. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-16 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDL. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 445). |
2016-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1537-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1371-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-23 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Ichiyama, Ito, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Ing, Kong, Tupola. |
2016-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to EDN ,FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR89 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.