HI HCR175 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources And The Sand Island Business Association To Continue Their Discussions Regarding The Sale Or Exchange Of Parcels Of Land Within The Sand Island Industrial Park.
Title
Sand Island Industrial Park; Sand Island Business Association; Department of Land and Natural Resources
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 04-01-13 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR142 (Same As) 2013-04-01 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=175&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR175_.HTM |