HI HCR93 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Referred to CPH/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Requiring Health Insurers To Provide Coverage For Clinical Victim Support Services For Victims Of Sexual Violence And Abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Requiring Health Insurers To Provide Coverage For Clinical Victim Support Services For Victims Of Sexual Violence And Abuse.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateReferred to CPH/WAM.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 609).
2019-04-04HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-04-04HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2).
2019-04-04HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2025), recommending adoption.
2019-04-03HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt.
2019-04-01HouseScheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308.
2019-03-27HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1768), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Cullen, Nakashima, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2019-03-19HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by LMG on Thursday, 03-21-19 3:05PM in conference room 312.
2019-03-19HouseRe-referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 37
2019-03-14HouseReferred to CPC/LMG, FIN, referral sheet 33
2019-03-08HouseOffered

Same As/Similar To

HR88 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback