HI HR138 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Speaker Of The House Of Representatives To Convene A Legislative Task Force To Assess The Impact Of The Potential Sale Of The Tesoro Oil Refinery On Consumers And The State.
Title
Task Force; Tesoro Oil Refinery
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] |
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Joseph Souki [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Hanohano, Thielen excused (3). | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1512-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Tsuji, Ching, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, Souki, Marumoto. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-02-12 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-02-12. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-29-12 2:35PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to CPC, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |