HI SB1083 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes additional native Hawaiian organizations for the DLNR to consult with to determine whether a burial site should be preserved in place or relocated and to develop a list of candidates for the burial councils. (SB1083 HD1)
Title
Burial Sites
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-07 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2009-04-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-2009 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused (6). | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1301) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Shimabukuro, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-25-09 9:30am in House conference room 329. | |
2009-03-19 | (H) Re-referred to HAW, FIN, referral sheet 34 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to WLO, HAW, FIN, referral sheet 28 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 296) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-03-05 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 473) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Fukunaga, Kokubun, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Bunda, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-18-09 3:30 PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to WTL. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |