HI SB1118 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 152, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-25 - Act 152, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii Public Housing Authority (HPHA) Board of Directors to set the salaries, not to exceed the Governor's salary, of the HPHA executive director, executive assistant, chief financial management advisor, property management branch chief, chief planner, and redevelopment officer. (CD1)
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Personnel
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-25 | House | Act 152, on 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255). |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Act 152, 6/21/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 20) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 20). |
2013-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Nakashima, Woodson, Jordan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Espero, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Espero replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Cabanilla, Nakashima, Woodson Co-Chairs; Jordan, Ward. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Green, Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Deferred until 04-11-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 454). |
2013-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1426), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Woodson. |
2013-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Say excused (2). |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported from HSG/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1075) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita. |
2013-03-18 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/LAB on Monday, 03-18-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-03-12 | House | Re-referred to HSG/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HSG, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 311) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 661) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 444) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-13 1:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB887 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to HSG, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5