HI SB1126 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning on November 1, 2019, requires all vulnerable coastal property sales or transfers to include a sea level rise hazard exposure statement to ensure that new property owners and transferees understand the special hazards, requirements, and limitations that may affect the property. Requires sellers to include whether property is within a sea level rise exposure area in the disclosure statement provided to the buyer. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Real Estate Disclosure.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-12 | House | Re-referred to WLH/EEP, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 31 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH/EEP, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 369) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 988) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 613) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-13-19 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-19 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WTL, CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1126 (Carry Over) 2019-03-12 - Re-referred to WLH/EEP, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 31