HI SB1207 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1207
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Pandemic & Disaster Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the head of a purchasing agency to obtain emergency procurements in certain situations that create a threat to life, public health, welfare, public property, or serous disruption to government services, including situations caused by equipment failures. Replaces Chief Procurement Officer approval with an accounting report to the Chief Procurement Officer in a timely manner and to the Legislature within sixty days after the end of the fiscal year in which the procurement was made. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to PDP/GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 384) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 973) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-03-21 10:35AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 365) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-09-21 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1053 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB1207 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to PDP/GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
SB1207 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to PDP/GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22