HI SB1208 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 088, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1188).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 088, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1188).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Employees' Retirement System Board of Trustees to hold a meeting closed to the public to discuss or decide upon certain matters. (SB1208 HD1)
Title
Employees' Retirement System; Trustees; Investments; Public Meetings; Closed Meetings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | Act 088, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1188). |
2015-06-10 | House | Act 088, on 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1188). |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-04-27 | House | Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. 22 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kidani, Nishihara. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-27-15. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-27-15. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-16-15 in disagreeing to the House amendments. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Ihara, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Slom. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-15 2:01PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Brower, McDermott. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Espero, Ihara, Shimabukuro, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 595). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1586), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1010) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Woodson. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-19-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-19-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 332) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 663) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-15 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. |