HI SB1213 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prevents any court from commencing a proceeding to enforce a lien or foreclosure action against real property owned by a reservist of the United States Armed Forces or member of the Hawaii National Guard until that reservist or member is redeployed from active duty for a period of one year. (SD1)
Title
National Guard; Foreclosure; Court Proceeding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 224) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Bunda, English, Kidani, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-09 1:00pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to PSM, CPN. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB879 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.