HI SB1247 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-08 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits: (1) a public employer from wilfully implementing or attempting to implement any term of a collective bargaining proposal without the exclusive representative's agreement; and (2) a public employee or employee organization from wilfully implementing or attempting to implement any term of a collective bargaining proposal without the employer's agreement.
Title
Collective Bargaining; Prohibited Practices; Public Employment; Bad Faith
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-08 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-08-13 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB578 (Same As) 2013-02-22 - The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1247&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB1247_.HTM |