HI SB1247 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-13 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants lessees of public land the right to relinquish a lease. Provides for the valuation of improvements to the land. Provides that a relinquishing lessee shall not automatically be required to remove improvements. Provides for disposition of the land at public auction after relinquishment. Defines "improvements" to include infrastructure.
Title
Public Lands; Relinquishment of Lease; Capital Improvements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-13 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-15 3:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB518 (Same As) 2015-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee excused (1).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1247&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB1247_.HTM |