HI SB165 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB165
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates reimbursement for services provided by participating registered pharmacists practicing within their scope of practice by private and public health plans in the State beginning January 1, 2024.
Title
Relating To Pharmacists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HHS, CPN. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1221 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB165 (Carry Over) 2023-01-23 - Referred to HHS, CPN.
SB165 (Carry Over) 2023-01-23 - Referred to HHS, CPN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=165&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB165_.HTM |