HI SB182 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB182
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows counties to adopt and enforce additional ordinances that regulate the sale or use of cigarettes, tobacco products, and electronic smoking devices. Requires county ordinances to be no less protective of public health than state law. Repeals statute that preempts local smoking ordinances and regulations and voids any local law or regulation that conflicts with state smoking laws.
Title
Relating To County Authority On The Sale Of Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from PSM/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB195 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB182 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
SB182 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
Subjects
Cigarettes
Counties
Electronic Smoking Devices
Home Rule
Maui County Package
Public Health
Smoking
Tobacco Use
Counties
Electronic Smoking Devices
Home Rule
Maui County Package
Public Health
Smoking
Tobacco Use