HI SB2019 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriation to restore the vector control branch of the DOH to fiscal year 2007-2008 funding levels. Effective 7/01/12.
Title
Appropriation; Vector Control Branch
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2186) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2012-01-24 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-18 | (S) Introduced. |