HI SB2073 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Act 077, 5/12/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Act 077, 5/12/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides fund authorizations and appropriations for collective bargaining cost items for collective bargaining unit (6) and its excluded counterparts. (CD1)
Title
Collective Bargaining Cost Items; Bargaining Unit (6); Appropriations ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | Senate | Act 077, 5/12/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177). |
2014-05-14 | House | Act 077, on 5/12/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1177). |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 107-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 107-14). |
2014-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Luke, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 5:15pm in conference room 325. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 4:15PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-17-14 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685). |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 674). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Luke Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Johanson Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Hee Chair; Ige Co-Chair; Shimabukuro Member. |
2014-04-10 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 531). |
2014-04-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Wooley excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1559-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-03-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Woodson. |
2014-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-27-14 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2014-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Say, Tokioka, Yamashita excused (4). |
2014-03-14 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 954-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-03-11 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Yamashita, Aquino, Takayama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2014-03-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-11-14 9:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2014-03-06 | House | Pass First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 94) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2564) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:20AM in conference room 211. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2036) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-24-14 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Introduced. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |