HI SB2399 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Restructures the Hawaii Invasive Species Council as the Hawaii Invasive Species Authority, to be administratively attached to the Department of Agriculture, to coordinate implementation of the Hawaii Interagency Biosecurity Plan and to improve coordination of the State's invasive species prevention, early detection, rapid response, control, enforcement, and outreach programs. Appropriates funds. (SB2399 HD1)
Title
Relating To Invasive Species Program Administration.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3). |
2018-03-20 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1234-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 173) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2699) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2069) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AEN/GVO, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |