HI SB2430 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allocates $12,000,000 of the transient accommodations tax revenues to the special land and development fund for the protection, improvement, and construction of natural resources and facilities associated with the visitor experience. (SD1)
Title
Transient Accommodations Tax; Special Land and Development Fund; Beach Restoration Special Fund; State Parks Special Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TSM/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2419) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Ihara. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSM/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-14 1:25PM in conference room 225. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to TSM/WTL, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2434 (Same As) 2014-05-23 - Act 081, 5/19/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1181).