HI SB2430 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the establishment of a pilot program to use dogs to inspect incoming cargo for illegal fireworks and explosives, after the cargo has been transported from the harbors.
Title
Relating To Cargo Inspections.
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee on TRE deferred the measure. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 10:15AM in conference room 225. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM/TRE, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2430&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB2430_.HTM |