HI SB2698 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - (S) Act 071, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1172).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - (S) Act 071, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1172).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the Chief Information Officer or the Chief Information Officer's designee as chair of the Information Privacy and Security Council. Effective July 1, 2012. (SB2698 HD1)
Title
Information Privacy and Security Council; Chief Information Officer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | (S) Act 071, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1172). | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Act 071, on 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1172). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 678). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Kahele. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) One Day Notice 04-12-12. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-12-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Deferred until 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 361). | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Hanohano, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Saiki, Wooley excused (3). | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1444-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Herkes, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, McKelvey. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-27-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 266) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2440) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Slom. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-12 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to EDT. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2436 (Same As) 2012-07-10 - (S) Vetoed on 07-10-12 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1393).