HI SB2768 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - (S) Act 066, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1167).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - (S) Act 066, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1167).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates underlying producer license requirement for applying and obtaining surplus lines broker license; provides greater clarity and consistency in licensing insurance producers selling annuity products; clarifies reinsurance intermediary licensing requirements and removes unnecessary licensing conditions. (SD1)
Title
Insurance; Licensing Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | (S) Act 066, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1167). | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Act 066, on 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1167). | |
2012-04-11 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 389). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1608-12), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Riviere. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-02-12 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes, Souki excused (2). | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 995-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Keith-Agaran, Souki, Tsuji, Ching, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-12-12 2:10PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 295) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2581) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on on 02-23-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-14 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2156) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Galuteria, Green, Nishihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-09-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-03-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-12 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2506 (Same As) 2012-02-16 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2).