HI SB2774 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - (S) Act 063, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1164).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - (S) Act 063, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1164).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the number of copies of government publications required to be deposited with the State Publications Distribution Center. Requires state and county agencies to notify the Center when electronic publications are made available. Requires the Chief Information Officer to review requirements necessary to implement an online distribution program. (SB2774 HD1)
Title
Government Publications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | (S) Act 063, 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1164). | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Act 063, on 4/24/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1164). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 746). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Kahele. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) One Day Notice 04-13-12. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-13-12. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 489). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1657-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-02-12 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1103-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-12 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Awana, Chang, Nakashima, Saiki, Takai, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hanohano, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Wooley. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-12-12 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 299) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2632) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on on 02-23-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from EDT/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2167) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ryan, Slom. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-12 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Re-Referred to EDT/PGM, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-25 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2512 (Same As) 2012-02-08 - (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and C. Lee excused (1).