HI SB3118 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Human Services to provide temporary emergency assistance, case management, and other recovery services following the period covered by an emergency proclamation and establishes an Emergency Management Program within the Director of Human Services' office. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation. Takes effect 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Emergency Public Assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reported from HHS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2220) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Awa. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HHS/PSM, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2429 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
DHS
Emergency Management Program
Expenditure Ceiling
Temporary Public Assistance After Emergencies
DHS
Emergency Management Program
Expenditure Ceiling
Temporary Public Assistance After Emergencies