HI SB423 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Act 082, 06/03/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Act 082, 06/03/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to the department of the prosecuting attorney of the city and county of Honolulu for the career criminal prosecution unit and victim witness assistance program. (CD1)
Title
Honolulu Prosecuting Attorney Package; Grants-in-Aid; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Senate | Act 082, 06/03/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182). |
2015-06-05 | House | Act 082, on 06/03/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1182). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tsuji excused (1). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 130) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 130). |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, DeCoite, Brower; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Slom. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 4:10PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 4:10PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-15 2:00PM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Brower, McDermott. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Keith-Agaran, Galuteria Co-Chairs; Harimoto, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 512). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-14-15. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1617) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-09 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2015-04-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-09-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1011), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-19 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Woodson. |
2015-03-17 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-19-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-19-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 129) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 741) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Galuteria. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-15 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 306) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Slom. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-15 9:10AM in conference room 016. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB210 (Same As) 2015-03-12 - Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.