HI SB432 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB432
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and appropriates moneys for a medical respite pilot program to offer medical, nursing, psychiatric, and other care for homeless individuals after being discharged from a hospital. Requires the department of human services to submit an application for an amendment to the QUEST Integration section 1115 demonstration project to expand its QUEST Integration project to provide for the medical respite pilot program.
Title
Relating To Homelessness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HOU/CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB432 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Human Services
Homelessness
Medicaid
Medical Respite Pilot Program
Section 1115 Demonstration Project
Department of Human Services
Homelessness
Medicaid
Medical Respite Pilot Program
Section 1115 Demonstration Project
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=432&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB432_.HTM |