HI SB708 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - The committee(s) on WAL/AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - The committee(s) on WAL/AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the requirement that state and county agencies and nonprofit land conservation organizations that receive legacy land funding must provide easements, deed restrictions, or covenants to county and federal natural resource conservation agencies. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
Legacy Land Conservation; Easement; Deed Restriction; Covenant
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on WAL/AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/AGR on Thursday, 03-14-13 11:05AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-11 | House | Re-referred to WAL/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 34 |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 196) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 711) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-13 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 293) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Dela Cruz, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, Ruderman. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AGL deferred the measure until 02-12-13 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AGL will hold a public decision making on 02-05-13 2:46PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AGL has rescheduled its public hearing to 01-31-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 2:00PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AGL, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |