HI SB739 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LAB, TRN/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a working group to research and explore the idea of developing and implementing a parking cash-out program. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Parking.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LAB, TRN/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 228) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1022) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-27-19 1:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH.
2019-02-14SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 360) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH.
2019-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-02-04SenateRe-Referred to TRS, CPH.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to TRS/LCA, CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback