HI SB767 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 283, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1403).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 283, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1403).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Raises the threshold under the contractor licensing law's handyman exemption from $1,000 to $1,500 and makes it applicable only to the cost of labor and materials. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Contractors.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Senate | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 283, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1403). |
2019-07-12 | House | Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 283, 07/10/2019, (Gov. Msg. No. 1403). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 35) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 35). |
2019-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 951). |
2019-04-22 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 952). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Added: Senator Ruderman added as Conferee. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 810). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi Chair; Ichiyama, Matsumoto. |
2019-04-01 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 542). |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-01-19. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Deferred One Day 03-29-19. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Deferred One Day 03-28-19. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 510). |
2019-03-25 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1561) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Belatti. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 239) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 788) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ruderman. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-19 9:35AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB69 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to CPH.