HI SB828 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB828
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Coastal Erosion Proactive Adaptation Plan Task Force, to be assisted by an Advisory Group, to develop a Coastal Erosion Proactive Adaptation Plan for streamlined and proactive shoreline permitting procedures that better mitigate impacts to Hawaii's coastal zone and lower the costs to public and private permit applicants. Appropriates funds to support the task force and establish one full-time equivalent (1.0 FTE) position in the Office of Planning to administer the coastal erosion proactive adaptation plan task force. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Coastal Erosion Proactive Adaptation Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 619) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB828 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB396 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on EEP/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB396 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on EEP/WLH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Advisory Group
Appropriation ($)
Coastal Erosion
Next Generation Coastal Zone Managers Program
Permits
Shoreline
Task Force
Appropriation ($)
Coastal Erosion
Next Generation Coastal Zone Managers Program
Permits
Shoreline
Task Force