HI SB854 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 115, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Act 115, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public school lands that are leased to benefit public educational purposes rather than simply to be used for public purposes. Authorizes the DOE to enter into lease back agreements. (CD1)
Title
Public School Lands; Lease
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Gilbert Kahele [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Act 115, 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215). |
2015-06-16 | House | Act 115, on 06/12/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 87) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-05-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 87). |
2015-05-01 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita, Ohno, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Tokuda, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 1:15PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-15 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Ohno, Matsumoto. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Tokuda, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs; Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 547). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1562), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, Luke excused (2). |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1090) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-23 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Ing, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-23-15 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Oshiro, Saiki, Say, Souki, Tokioka, Woodson excused (8). |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 929) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL. |
2015-03-16 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Kong, LoPresti, Tsuji, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Tupola. |
2015-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-16-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to EDN, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 225) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 781) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from EDU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 321) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to EDU/GVO, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB230 (Same As) 2015-02-06 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto, Tokioka excused (3).