HI SB867 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 282, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1388).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Sets the base monthly contributions for health benefit plans, including two-party plans, paid by the State and counties for retired employees to specified amounts beginning 01/01/14. Effective 01/01/14. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund; Retired Employees; State and County Contributions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-09SenateBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 282, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1388).
2013-07-09HouseBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 282, 7/9/2013, (Gov. Msg. No. 1388).
2013-05-07SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2013-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
2013-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755).
2013-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2013-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-30-13.
2013-04-26HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 149) as amended in (CD 1).
2013-04-26Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
2013-04-26SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 149).
2013-04-26HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-26SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Ige, Kouchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
2013-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2013-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2013-04-19SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2013-04-18SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 325.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Nakashima, Hashem Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Johanson.
2013-04-15SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Hee, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, L. Thielen, Slom.
2013-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692).
2013-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607).
2013-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2013-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 553).
2013-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Fale, Kawakami, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-04-05HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1595), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-04-02HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson, Ward.
2013-03-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2013-03-22HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Fale, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3).
2013-03-22HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1136) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-03-12HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamane, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-03-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-12-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2013-03-07HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 30
2013-03-07HousePass First Reading
2013-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 217) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
2013-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 803) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
2013-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-02-14SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 279) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2013-01-22SenateReferred to JDL, WAM.
2013-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1175 (Same As) 2013-01-28 - Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback