HI SB930 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 144, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a means for the EUTF to void claims for reimbursement of medicare part B premiums or any other debt payable that totals less than $500 and is older than ten years. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Unclaimed Property Of The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-11HouseAct 144, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245).
2017-07-11SenateAct 144, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1245).
2017-05-04SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 104) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 104).
2017-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole.
2017-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-20SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 325.
2017-04-19SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 1:30PM in conference room 325.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Taniguchi Co-Chair; L. Thielen.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Holt Co-Chairs; Keohokalole, Matsumoto.
2017-04-11HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 675).
2017-04-11SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2017-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 532).
2017-04-07HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-04-07HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1722), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-04-04HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-03-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2017-03-21HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1183) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2017-03-16HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-16-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
2017-03-09HouseReferred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 297) in amended form (SD 2).
2017-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-02SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 566) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2017-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2017-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
2017-02-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2017-02-16SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 376) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2017-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
2017-02-09SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2017-01-25SenateReferred to JDL, WAM.
2017-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1064 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback