HI SB971 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 095, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Act 095, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that certain eligible housing projects will remain affordable for certain minimum periods in order to be certified for exemption from general excise taxes. (CD1)
Title
General Excise Tax Exemptions for Certified or Approved Housing Projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Senate | Act 095, 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195). |
2015-06-10 | House | Act 095, on 06/05/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1195). |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680). |
2015-05-05 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699). |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2015-04-30 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 20) as amended in (CD 1). |
2015-04-30 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 20). |
2015-04-28 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Kobayashi, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2015-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-28-15 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 10:30AM in conference room 229. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Jordan, Fukumoto Chang. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Green, Ruderman, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Deferred until 04-16-15. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 450). |
2015-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1508), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, Oshiro, Saiki, Say, Souki, Tokioka, Woodson excused (8). |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 931) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-16 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Oshiro. |
2015-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 03-16-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 244) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 871) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 11) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HSH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HSH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HSH, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |