HI SCR160 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to WAL, EDN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-15 - Referred to WAL, EDN, referral sheet 54
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Office Of Planning To Establish A Working Group To Determine Potential Parcels Of Land Under The Ownership Of The State Or The City And County Of Honolulu Where Jurisdiction Should Be Exchanged To Facilitate Specific Missions.
Title
State-owned Land; County-owned Land; Jurisdiction; Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to WAL, EDN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 672) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1469) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from EGH/WTL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1219), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Dela Cruz, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, Ruderman. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Wakai. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH/WTL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-13 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to EGH/WTL/PSM, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=160&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR160_.HTM |