HI SCR201 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Sister-state Committee To Evaluate And Develop Recommendations For The Initiation Of A Sister State Relationship Between The State Of Hawaii And The Prefecture Of Hokkaido, Japan, And Forward Its Recommendation To The Legislature, Pursuant To Section 229-3, Hawaii Revised Statutes, For Further Action.
Title
Sister-State Relationship Between Hawaii and Hokkaido, Japan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 677). |
2015-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-05-01 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McDermott, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (4). |
2015-05-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1687), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Ward. |
2015-04-24 | House | Resolution scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-27-15 2:05PM in conference room 308. |
2015-04-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, Ito, Say, Takumi excused (4). |
2015-04-17 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1662), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-04-15 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka, Matsumoto, Ward. |
2015-04-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 04-15-15 10:15AM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-06 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 46 |
2015-04-02 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 387) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-02-15. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported from TSI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1193) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TSI were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kahele, English, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on TSI has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-15 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to TSI. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |