HI SCR27 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR27
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Sunrise Review Of The Licensure And Regulation Of Home Inspectors.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Sunrise Review Of The Licensure And Regulation Of Home Inspectors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2018-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-23 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Evans, Hashem, Say excused (3). |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2056-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-19-18 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1998-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Johanson, LoPresti, Say, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Mizuno, Tokioka, Yamane. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 04-12-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 498) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3396) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 03-28-18 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2539), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to CPH. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Green ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 3:15PM in conference room 225. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to HOU, CPH. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to GVO/CPH. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR27 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.