HI SCR62 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR62
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Members Of The United States Congress To Enact Federal Legislation Granting Statehood To The People Of Washington, D.c.
Title
Urging Members Of The United States Congress To Enact Federal Legislation Granting Statehood To The People Of Washington, D.c.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 32 |
2021-03-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 505). |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Kim, Riviere). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-31-21. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1324) with recommendation of adoption. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Riviere; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-21 1:10PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR62 (Carry Over) 2021-04-01 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 32
SR44 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
SR44 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-21-21.
Subjects
Federal Legislation Granting Statehood for people of Washington, D.C.
Members of United States Congress
Members of United States Congress