HI SR12 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR12
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Additional Funding For Education From The United States Department Of Education.
Title
Requesting Additional Funding For Education From The United States Department Of Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Resolution Adopted. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-17. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Waived referral to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1179), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR12 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.