HI SR129 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Transportation To Develop A Plan For The Establishment Of A Ports Authority For Airports And Harbors.
Title
DOT; Port Authority; Airports; Harbors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1), with Senator Slom voting "No". |
2015-04-06 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-07-15. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Reported from TRA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1300) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Inouye, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 2:50PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to TRA. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |