HI SR51 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Establish A Hawaii Public Schools Financial Literacy Task Force.
Title
Financial Literacy; Public Schools; Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Ronald Kouchi [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-15. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1320) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Slom. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-15 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |