HI SR80 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The University Of Hawaii At Manoa College Of Tropical Agriculture And Human Resources Convene A Working Group To Develop A Coordinated Framework Of Support For Preschool Through Post-secondary Agriculture Education.
Title
Agriculture Education; P-20 Education
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-08-15. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported from HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1327) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kidani, Wakai. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 2:00PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to HEA. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=80&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SR80_.HTM |