IA HF2495 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 689.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning federal financial assistance funding for hazard mitigation. (Formerly HSB 625.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning federal financial assistance funding for hazard mitigation. (Formerly HSB 625.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 689. |
2020-03-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-03-03 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2020 1:15PM House Lounge. |
2020-03-03 | House | Subcommittee: Bossman, Running-Marquardt and Worthan. H.J. 444. |
2020-02-25 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 331. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3057 (Related) 2020-02-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2188.
HSB625 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 299.
SF2188 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Fiscal note.
HSB625 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 299.
SF2188 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2495 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2495.html |