IA HF2568 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Read first time, attached to similar SF 2390. S.J. 590.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Read first time, attached to similar SF 2390. S.J. 590.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a cyber crime investigation unit in the department of public safety to investigate crimes with a nexus to the internet or computer technology including crimes involving child exploitation and cyber intrusion. (Formerly HSB 616.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing a cyber crime investigation unit in the department of public safety to investigate crimes with a nexus to the internet or computer technology including crimes involving child exploitation and cyber intrusion. (Formerly HSB 616.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read first time, attached to similar SF 2390. S.J. 590. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 590. |
2020-03-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 564. |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed House, yeas 100, nays none. H.J. 548. |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendment H-8094 withdrawn. H.J. 547. |
2020-03-05 | House | Amendment H-8094 filed. H.J. 516. |
2020-03-04 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 374. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3010 (Related) 2020-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2390.
HSB616 (Related) 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 328.
SF2390 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Attached to similar HF 2568. S.J. 590.
HSB616 (Related) 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 328.
SF2390 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Attached to similar HF 2568. S.J. 590.