IA HF2686 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the organization, structure, and functions of state and local governments, providing for salaries of certain state officers, making statutory corrections, resolving inconsistencies, removing ambiguities, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2550, HSB 664.) Effective date: 06/21/2024, 07/01/2024
Title
A bill for an act relating to the organization, structure, and functions of state and local governments, providing for salaries of certain state officers, making statutory corrections, resolving inconsistencies, removing ambiguities, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HF 2550, HSB 664.) Effective date: 06/21/2024, 07/01/2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5150 be adopted? (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5151 be adopted? (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5150 be adopted? (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5149 be adopted? (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - Shall amendment H–8288 be adopted? (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5150 be adopted? (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5151 be adopted? (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5150 be adopted? (Y: 13 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5149 be adopted? (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - Shall amendment H–8288 be adopted? (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/26. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 842. |
2024-04-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 803. |
2024-04-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 63, nays 34. H.J. 796. |
2024-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8310. H.J. 795. |
2024-04-11 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-10 | House | Senate amendment H-8310 filed. H.J. 775. |
2024-04-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 762. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 798. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 13. S.J. 797. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5148 filed, adopted. S.J. 797. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5149 filed, lost. S.J. 796. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5151 filed, lost. S.J. 795. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5150 filed, lost. S.J. 795. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Substituted for SF 2416. S.J. 794. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read first time, attached to SF 2416. S.J. 773. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 773. |
2024-04-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 751. |
2024-04-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 62, nays 35. H.J. 750. |
2024-04-09 | House | Amendment H-8288, yeas 97, nays 0, filed, adopted. H.J. 750. |
2024-04-08 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-04-03 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 719. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3144 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2377.
HSB664 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2550.
HF2550 (Similar To) 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 757.
SF2377 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2416. S.J. 615.
SF2416 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 798.
HSB664 (Related) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2550.
HF2550 (Similar To) 2024-04-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 757.
SF2377 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2416. S.J. 615.
SF2416 (Similar To) 2024-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 798.