IA HF4 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of fees when a public defender or designee requests copies of certain documents. (See HF 529; HF 753.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of fees when a public defender or designee requests copies of certain documents. (See HF 529; HF 753.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 922. |
2019-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 346. |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2019 2:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Bergan and Meyer, B.. H.J. 129. |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 87. |
Same As/Similar To
SF52 (Similar To) 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
HF529 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
HF753 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1112.
HF529 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
HF753 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1112.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF4 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF4.html |