IA HF753 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of fees when a public defender or designee requests copies of certain documents. (Formerly HF 529 and HF 4.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of fees when a public defender or designee requests copies of certain documents. (Formerly HF 529 and HF 4.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1112. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Dotzler, and Schultz. S.J. 1044. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1026. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1026. |
2019-04-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 922. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1013. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed House, yeas 95 nays 1. H.J. 918. |
2019-04-02 | House | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-28 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 673. |
Same As/Similar To
SF52 (Similar To) 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
HF4 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
HF529 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
HF4 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
HF529 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.