IA HF529 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of fees when a public defender or designee requests copies of certain documents. (Formerly HF 4; See HF 753.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the assessment of fees when a public defender or designee requests copies of certain documents. (Formerly HF 4; See HF 753.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 922. |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 624. |
2019-03-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-03-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2019 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-03-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2019 10:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-18 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Sieck and Wolfe. H.J. 565. |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 357. |
Same As/Similar To
SF52 (Similar To) 2019-01-23 - Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation.
HF4 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
HF753 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1112.
HF4 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
HF753 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 1112.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF529 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF529.html |