IA HF752 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Subcommittee reassigned: Schultz, Giddens, and R. Smith. S.J. 976.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Subcommittee reassigned: Schultz, Giddens, and R. Smith. S.J. 976.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to professional licensing, including by providing for a review of professional licenses and allowing for preapplication qualification reviews, and providing fees. (Formerly HF 666 and HSB 180.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to professional licensing, including by providing for a review of professional licenses and allowing for preapplication qualification reviews, and providing fees. (Formerly HF 666 and HSB 180.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Schultz, Giddens, and R. Smith. S.J. 976. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Giddens. S.J. 848. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read first time, referred to State Government. S.J. 821. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 821. |
2019-04-01 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 704. |
2019-04-26 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1055. |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed House, yeas 54, nays 44. H.J. 703. |
2019-04-01 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 702. |
2019-04-01 | House | Motion to suspend rules to consider H-1092. H.J. 702. |
2019-04-01 | House | Point of order raised on H-1092, ruled not germane. H.J. 701. |
2019-04-01 | House | Amendment H-1095 to H-1092 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 701. |
2019-04-01 | House | Amendment H-1094 to H-1092 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 701. |
2019-04-01 | House | Amendment H-1090 adopted. H.J. 701. |
2019-04-01 | House | Amendment H-1091 adopted. H.J. 701. |
2019-03-29 | House | Amendments H-1090, H-1091 and H-1092 filed. H.J. 694. |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 664. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB180 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 405.
HF666 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 704.
HF666 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Withdrawn. H.J. 704.